Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 580 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 10970 Month
» 163923 Year
» 1829299 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1287 m/e 05/1908
British Railways 31287 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1908
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C   Hither Green 6w/e 01/04/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 9w/e 01/04/1957
WDN   w/e 08/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1287
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31287    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31287    
11/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev