Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1294 m/e 06/1908
British Railways 31294 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal During 10/1955
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1908
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 9w/e 01/06/1948
73B   Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 22/04/1950
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   w/e 24/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1294
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
01/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31294    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31294    
10/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev