Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2645 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16051 Week
» 69067 Month
» 188594 Year
» 3215447 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1297 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
British Railways |
31297 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/09/1959 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1297 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31297 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
27/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31297 |
|
|