Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 38 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2836 Week
» 14518 Month
» 167471 Year
» 1832847 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1305 m/e 05/1906
British Railways 31305 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 56 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1906
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 9w/e 30/06/1952
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 11/12/1952
73E   Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/10/1955
75D   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 73E Faversham 2w/e 10/06/1953
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73E Faversham 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73E Faversham 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 73E Faversham 5w/e 12/08/1955
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/11/1945 Hastings A special empty troop train of ten corridors, weighing 325 tons, from the Brighton direction to Dover, on 3/11, was worked by E1 1067, which called at Hastings for water, and to change guards. It was assisted up the 1 in 60 towards Ore by H 1305, which was an unusual engine to be working on the weekday Ashford-Hastings service. SLS/194602
05/03/1951 Ashford Works In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1305
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31305    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31305    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev