Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 426 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14469 Week
» 79423 Month
» 282087 Year
» 3308940 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1308 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
British Railways |
31308 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
30/12/1953 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1308 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31308 |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31308 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|