Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 29 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 847 Week
» 17798 Month
» 170751 Year
» 1836127 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1311 m/e 05/1907
British Railways 31311 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/11/1954
Service Life 47 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1907
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill 9w/e 30/06/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 06/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
REINS 75B Redhill m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
WDN   w/e 06/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1311
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31311    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 31311    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev