Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 570 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4252 Week
» 10960 Month
» 163913 Year
» 1829289 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1315 m/e 04/1909
British Railways 31315 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/03/1954
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1954

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1909
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 4w/e 19/03/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 20/03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/03/1951
REINS 73E Faversham 8w/e 19/03/1952
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 4w/e 08/01/1953
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 26/05/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 2w/e 10/06/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 18/11/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 6w/e 08/02/1954
WDN   w/e 20/03/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1315
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31315    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
20/03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 31315    
10/1954 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev