Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 589 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4271 Week
» 10979 Month
» 163932 Year
» 1829308 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1317 m/e 03/1908
British Railways 31317 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/02/1962
Service Life 53 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1908
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951
74C   Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 9w/e 12/06/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 24/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 11/06/1957
WDN   w/e 24/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1317
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31317    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
24/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31317    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev