Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1319 m/e 12/1909
British Railways 31319 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/01/1960
Service Life 50 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1909
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74E   St Leonards 5w/e 09/10/1950
75A   Brighton 5w/e 24/08/1953
75B   Redhill 6w/e 21/06/1955
75A   Brighton 4w/e 10/10/1955
74A   Ashford 7w/e 20/04/1956
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 30/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 24/08/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 74A Ashford 9w/e 10/04/1956
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 30/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1950 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
30/06/1950 General Three I.1X locomotives have recently been transferred from Bognor to New Cross Gate, namely 2002, 2008, 2596.
'H' tanks Nos. 1158 an 1319 are being fitted for pull-and-push working.
'D.3' 32365, of air attack fame, originally Victoria, has been repaired at Ashford.
Several 'B.4X' ex store were working at the end of June, in readiness for use if required on Farnborough Air Pageant Specials; for these the E.R. (G.E. Section) lent a number of Westinghouse-fitted trains as traffic was expected to be heavy.
SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1319
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1950 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31319    
09/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
20/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
30/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31319    
02/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev