Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1322 m/e 06/1909
British Railways 31322 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1961
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1909
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 27/07/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 21/06/1955
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
75A   Brighton 4w/e 06/05/1960
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 06/05/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 22/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1322
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31322    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
22/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31322    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev