Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2837 Week
» 14519 Month
» 167472 Year
» 1832848 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1323 m/e 07/1910
British Railways 31323 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/07/1960
Service Life 50 yrs , 9 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1910
FOL   Folkestone Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 2w/e 13/08/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 18/11/1953
WDN   w/e 09/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1949 Industrial notes N.C.B. Snowdown Colliery: British Railways 0-6-OT No. 31323 is on loan here, and was seen at work several times at the end of September. Only one of the colliery's two regular 0-6-0ST's was seen, and this was too far off to be identified. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1323
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Folkestone Junction (FOL)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31323    
09/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31323    

prev prev