Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 39 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 857 Week
» 17808 Month
» 170761 Year
» 1836137 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1325 m/e 07/1910
British Railways 31325 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/03/1960
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1910
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BTN   Brighton 4w/e 01/04/1948
ELH   Eastleigh 6w/e 26/09/1949
75A   Brighton 4w/e 05/02/1951
71A   Eastleigh 9w/e 12/06/1957
75A   Brighton 3w/e 13/10/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 6w/e 26/09/1949
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 13/10/1958
WDN   w/e 19/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Loanees returned 1325/73 have been returned ex loan to the Betteshanger Colliery and the E.K.R. respectively. SLS/194605
24/03/1946 County Names Locomotives of the '1000' class are being named after English and Welsh counties, a straight nameplate being fixed along the single splasher. No. 1000 is named 'County of Middlesex.' Twenty-nine other locomotives of the class are being named after the following counties: Bucks, Berks, Wilts, Oxford, Somerset, Devon, Cornwall, Dorset, Brecknock, Cardigan, Carmarthen, Carnarvon, Cheshire, Denbigh, Glamorgan, Merioneth, Monmouth, Gloucester, Hereford, Leicester, Northampton, Hants, Montgomery, Pembroke, Radnor, Salop, Stafford, Warwick, and Worcester. This revives the 'County' class outside cylinder 4-4-0 naming of years ago. Incidentally the naming of 'Halls' has been resumed. SLS/194605
26/03/1946 Surbiton 903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Loanees returned 1325/73 have been returned ex loan to the Betteshanger Colliery and the E.K.R. respectively. SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1325
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (BTN)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31325    
26/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    
19/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31325    

prev prev