Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 566 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4248 Week
» 10956 Month
» 163909 Year
» 1829285 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1326 m/e 12/1906
British Railways 31326 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 54 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1906
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
74B   Ramsgate 9w/e 30/06/1952
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73H   Dover Marine 4w/e 19/08/1959
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 08/07/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine 5w/e 19/08/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 04/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1326
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31326    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
19/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31326    
11/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev