Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 41 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 859 Week
» 17810 Month
» 170763 Year
» 1836139 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1328 m/e 12/1906
British Railways 31328 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1961
Service Life 54 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1906
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STL   St Leonards 5w/e 04/02/1950
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 19/03/1952
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 08/07/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 25/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1947 Bricklayers Arms Works The Works at Bricklayers' Arms contained only five engines, Nos. 1231, 1328, 1386, 2166 and 21C127. Nos. 1261 and 1386 were without tenders, but one tender was also in the shop. The other one was outside. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1328
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31328    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (STL)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
25/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31328    
04/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev