Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 42 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 17811 Month
» 170764 Year
» 1836140 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1337 m/e 06/1888
British Railways 31337 y/e 1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1888
Withdrawal During 02/1960
Service Life 71 yrs , 8 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1888
FOL   Folkestone Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 05/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1888 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1337
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Folkestone Junction (FOL)    
1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 31337    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31337    
05/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev