Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1488 m/e 07/1902
British Railways 31488 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/02/1956
Service Life 53 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1902
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill 4w/e 08/12/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E   Reading (S.R.) w/e 06/12/1951
70C   Guildford 4w/e 10/10/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 04/02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 74D Tonbridge m/e 31/08/1950
REINS 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70E Reading (S.R.) w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954
REINS 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70E Reading (S.R.) 5w/e 12/08/1955
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 10/10/1955
WDN   w/e 04/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/09/1945 Eastern Section Schools Class 930 (BAS) has been working on the Eastern Section at least since 23/9 when she worked to Hastings. She has a high sided self-trimming tender. Class C 1480 has been transferred from STL, where D class 1488 has joined 1075, 1740/4, the latter being shown as Class D1 in error in the allocation published in the November Journal. B1 1021, 1440/55/7 are TON. SLS/194602
23/07/1950 Excursion to High Brooms On 23rd July 1950, the train to Hildenborough, Tonbridge, and High Brooms from Victoria (Central Section) ran via Crystal Palace, Bromley South and Orpington-with stops at those stations and at Clapham Jc. The 11 bogies were hauled by U.1 No. 31904 to Tonbridge where D No. 31488 was coupled on to assist this heavy load up the 1 in 47/53 grades to High Brooms. I was reliably informed that no steam train has been advertised to call at Crystal Palace since prior to the 1936 fire which destroyed the exhibition buildings there. On 17th September a similar routing was used to Bickley for an ex-cursion to Charing and Hothfield, consisting of 11 bogies hauled by B.o.B. No. 34067 Tangmere. It is doubtful whether an engine of this class has previously travelled between Balham and Beckenham Jc. On the return journey severe slipping occurred when restarting at Crystal Palace, due to the considerable curvature and gradient to the tunnel entrance. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1488
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31488    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
02/1956 Scrapped Scrapped    
04/02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31488    

prev prev