Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 585 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4267 Week
» 10975 Month
» 163928 Year
» 1829304 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1490 m/e 08/1902
British Railways 31490 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1902
Withdrawal During 09/1951
Service Life 49 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1902
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 3w/e 28/05/1949
75B   Redhill 4w/e 08/12/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE TON Tonbridge 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 3w/e 28/05/1949
TOSTORE 74D Tonbridge m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   w/e 25/08/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1490
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31490    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31490    

prev prev