Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1505 m/e 02/1907
British Railways 31505 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/09/1961
Service Life 54 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1907
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 8w/e 27/06/1951
73E   Faversham 9w/e 30/06/1952
73E   Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 18/06/1954
73E   Faversham 6w/e 21/06/1955
74A   Ashford 4w/e 10/10/1955
73E   Faversham 3w/e 01/11/1955
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 30/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 27/06/1951
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 04/06/1955
TOSTORE 74A Ashford 3w/e 10/10/1955
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 7w/e 01/11/1955
REINS 73E Faversham 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/11/1951 Ashford Works 31523 was recently seen being pulled to pieces, even crank axles and cylinders being cut up. It was with some surprise, therefore, that 31523 emerges, yesterday, resplendent in lined black. We have been informed that she has a spare set of frames (from 1547?) and new cylinders cast at Ashford. 31735, which has been in the shed for six months, is now in the works for new cylinders, and 31505 an 31494, which have been outside the works for the whole year, have also gone in for similar attention. SLS/195201
04/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1505
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31505    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
01/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
30/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31505    
11/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev