Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 585 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4267 Week
» 10975 Month
» 163928 Year
» 1829304 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1507 m/e 09/1908
British Railways 31507 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1908
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 28/05/1949
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B   Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/05/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 06/05/1960
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/12/1948 Ashford Works Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. SLS/194901
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1507
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31507    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31507    
08/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev