Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 47 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2845 Week
» 14527 Month
» 167480 Year
» 1832856 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1510 m/e 07/1904
British Railways 31510 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/06/1962
Service Life 58 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1904
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73B   Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1510
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31510    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
30/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31510    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev