Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 29 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 847 Week
» 17798 Month
» 170751 Year
» 1836127 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1512 m/e 01/1909
British Railways 31512 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/06/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1909
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford w/e 06/12/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 19/12/1955
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 10/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/11/1946
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 74A Ashford w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 19/12/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 10/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1512
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31512    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
19/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
10/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31512    
08/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev