Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 588 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4270 Week
» 10978 Month
» 163931 Year
» 1829307 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1516 m/e 04/1908
British Railways 31516 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1908
Withdrawal Sat 06/10/1951
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1908
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/06/1948
AFD   Ashford 3w/e 28/05/1949
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 04/02/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
     Withdrawn on 06/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/06/1948
TOSTORE BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 04/09/1948
TOSTORE BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC AFD Ashford 3w/e 28/05/1949
TOSTORE AFD Ashford 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
WDN   on 06/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1516
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31516    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (AFD)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
06/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31516    

prev prev