Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1517 m/e 01/1909
British Railways 31517 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1909
Withdrawal During 05/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1909
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 5w/e 04/02/1950
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 06/10/1951
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 08/10/1951
74D   Tonbridge 6w/e 21/06/1955
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 04/06/1955
WDN   w/e 03/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1517
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31517    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31517    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev