Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 580 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 10970 Month
» 163923 Year
» 1829299 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1520 m/e 06/1909
British Railways 31520 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal During 08/1960
Service Life 51 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1909
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 4w/e 31/07/1949
74A   Ashford 7w/e 22/04/1950
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 14/03/1951
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 20/03/1951
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 12/05/1951
74E   St Leonards 6w/e 21/06/1955
74A   Ashford q/e 06/06/1958
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 4w/e 31/07/1949
ALLOC 74A Ashford 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 03/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1949 \"H\" Class 0-4-4T\'s Five 'H' Class 0-4-4T's, Nos. 31016, 1164, 21182, 31520 an 1523, have been fitted for pull-and-push working, to replace the 'D.3' 0-4-4T's now being withdrawn. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1520
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31520    
31/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31520    
09/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev