Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 23 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 841 Week
» 17792 Month
» 170745 Year
» 1836121 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1522 m/e 08/1909
British Railways 31522 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/01/1963
Service Life 53 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1909
RAM   Ramsgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 19/03/1952
75E   Three Bridges 6w/e 14/06/1959
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 26/11/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West P 26/11/1959
WDN   w/e 27/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1522
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31522    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
27/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31522    
02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev