Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1523 m/e 09/1909
British Railways 31523 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/01/1959
Service Life 49 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1909
RAM   Ramsgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 6w/e 26/09/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 10/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 6w/e 26/09/1949
WDN   w/e 10/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1949 \"H\" Class 0-4-4T\'s Five 'H' Class 0-4-4T's, Nos. 31016, 1164, 21182, 31520 an 1523, have been fitted for pull-and-push working, to replace the 'D.3' 0-4-4T's now being withdrawn. SLS/194908
04/11/1951 Ashford Works 31523 was recently seen being pulled to pieces, even crank axles and cylinders being cut up. It was with some surprise, therefore, that 31523 emerges, yesterday, resplendent in lined black. We have been informed that she has a spare set of frames (from 1547?) and new cylinders cast at Ashford. 31735, which has been in the shed for six months, is now in the works for new cylinders, and 31505 an 31494, which have been outside the works for the whole year, have also gone in for similar attention. SLS/195201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1523
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31523    
26/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
01/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
10/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31523    

prev prev