Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 850 Week
» 17801 Month
» 170754 Year
» 1836130 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1533 m/e 07/1905
British Railways 31533 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1905
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73J   Tonbridge 4w/e 06/05/1960
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 26/05/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 05/04/1960
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/04/1960 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1533
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31533    
05/04/1960 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31533    

prev prev