Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 39 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2837 Week
» 14519 Month
» 167472 Year
» 1832848 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1540 m/e 11/1904
British Railways 31540 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/02/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1904
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
DOV   Dover Marine 5w/e 04/02/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 5w/e 04/02/1950
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/01/1953
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 27/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1540
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31540    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
27/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31540    
04/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev