Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 562 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4244 Week
» 10952 Month
» 163905 Year
» 1829281 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1543 m/e 01/1909
British Railways 31543 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Service Life 54 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1909
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RAM   Ramsgate 6w/e 26/09/1949
73B   Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/11/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 29/10/1953
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 05/10/1960
73J   Tonbridge 4w/e 24/11/1960
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 26/05/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 26/09/1949
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 6w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1543
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
26/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31543    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
29/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31543    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev