Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 40 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 858 Week
» 17809 Month
» 170762 Year
» 1836138 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1545 m/e 09/1906
British Railways 31545 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/03/1961
Service Life 54 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1906
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 05/02/1951
73E   Faversham 4w/e 11/04/1951
73E   Faversham 4w/e 13/04/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) w/e 06/12/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 26/05/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 20/07/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 6w/e 21/06/1955
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 11/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 11/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Victoria Station S.E. & C. 4-4-O's of various classes, including Nos. 1515, 1545, and 1760 have been noted piloting 'H2' No. 2423 on Victoria-Newhaven boat trains which have not been loaded above the recent 4-4-2 capacity, but it was probably on account of the service slacks due to landslides and track repairs following the severe weather. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1545
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31545    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
11/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31545    
05/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev