Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 568 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4250 Week
» 10958 Month
» 163911 Year
» 1829287 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1546 m/e 11/1904
British Railways 31546 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal During 02/1951
Service Life 46 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1904
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 27/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/03/1951 Dover Scrapyard Certain withdrawn locomotives have recently been scrapped at Dover in a yard belonging to Dover Industries Ltd. This yard is adjacent to the eastern arm of Dover harbour, and is easily visible from a public footpath up the cliffs nearby. Engines are towed there along the sea front, and the track along this route has been relaid and set in concrete. A 'P' class 0-6-0T is used for motive power, though it is rumoured that diesels may be used later. No. 31511 is said to have been cut up here in February, but confirmation is required. On 1st March 1951, the only thing visible in the yard which could be identified as part of a locomotive was a bunker with the number 31546 (from an 'H' class 0-4-4T) and this was being cut up by oxy-acetylene equipment. The 0-4-2T No. 2359, still outside Dover shed, is used as a stationary boiler. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1546
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31546    
02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31546    
03/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev