Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 577 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 10967 Month
» 163920 Year
» 1829296 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1548 m/e 12/1904
British Railways 31548 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/08/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1904
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 5w/e 04/02/1950
73D   Gillingham (Kent) q/e 06/06/1958
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 08/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1548
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31548    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31548    
09/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev