Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 560 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4242 Week
» 10950 Month
» 163903 Year
» 1829279 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1549 m/e 09/1906
British Railways 31549 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/10/1956
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1906
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
70C   Guildford 5w/e 16/09/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 74D Tonbridge m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 16/09/1955
WDN   w/e 20/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1549
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31549    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
16/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
1956 Scrapped Scrapped    
20/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31549    

prev prev