Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 40 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 858 Week
» 17809 Month
» 170762 Year
» 1836138 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1551 m/e 01/1905
British Railways 31551 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 59 yrs , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1905
9E   Nine Elms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill 4w/e 01/10/1953
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 10/12/1953
75B   Redhill 4w/e 30/12/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 8w/e 13/05/1954
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 05/10/1960
75E   Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 10w/e 10/12/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 6w/e 30/12/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 6w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1551
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31551    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
30/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31551    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev