Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 567 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4249 Week
» 10957 Month
» 163910 Year
» 1829286 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1552 m/e 01/1905
British Railways 31552 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961
Service Life 56 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1905
9E   Nine Elms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 01/10/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 6w/e 18/06/1954
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73F   Ashford 4w/e 10/03/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 27/03/1953
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 26/05/1953
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 74D Tonbridge 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73F Ashford 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted
30/12/1953 Push and Pull Equipment Removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1552
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31552    
01/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
30/12/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Equipment Removed    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31552    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev