Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 46 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 864 Week
» 17815 Month
» 170768 Year
» 1836144 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1557 m/e 02/1909
British Railways 31557 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/09/1957
Service Life 48 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1909
BTN   Brighton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
DOV   Dover Marine 3w/e 28/05/1949
73A   Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 21/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
WDN   w/e 21/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1557
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31557    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
09/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    
21/09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 31557    

prev prev