Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 558 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4240 Week
» 10948 Month
» 163901 Year
» 1829277 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1573 m/e 09/1903
British Railways 31573 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/11/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1903
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C   Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 18/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1573
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31573    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
18/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31573    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev