Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 47 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 17816 Month
» 170769 Year
» 1836145 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1574 m/e 02/1907
British Railways 31574 y/e 1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/10/1956
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1907
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
AFD   Ashford P 02/01/1948
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
70C   Guildford 5w/e 16/09/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 06/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AFD Ashford P 02/01/1948
TOSTORE AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/06/1948
REINS 74A Ashford w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 16/09/1955
WDN   w/e 06/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (SR) Engines running with Southern Numbers. (March 1952) 42, 87, 88, 93, 162, 224, 304, 311, 691, 1064/5, 1191, 1276, 1336, 1491/3, 1558, 1574, 1673, 1693, 1708, 1711/8, 1755, 2133, 2328, 2418, 2485, 2560/73, 2608. Stored (oil-burners): 170, 172, 411, 437. Recently in shops: 282, 2408. Some of these may be renumbered, as there has been no recent official advice. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1574
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
02/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (AFD)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 31574    
16/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
06/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31574    
01/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev