Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1575 m/e 09/1903
British Railways 31575 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 57 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1903
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B   Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (being cut up) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1575
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31575    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31575    

prev prev