Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1584 m/e 06/1903
British Railways 31584 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/02/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 17/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1584
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31584    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
17/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31584    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev