Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 584 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4266 Week
» 10974 Month
» 163927 Year
» 1829303 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1587 m/e 02/1907
British Railways 31587 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/07/1951
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1907
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RED   Redhill P 02/01/1948
HIT   Hither Green 7w/e 03/05/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 28/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HOR Horsham P 01/12/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill P 02/01/1948
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 7w/e 03/05/1949
REINS 74E St Leonards m/e 31/08/1950
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 28/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1587
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
02/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
03/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31587    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
28/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31587    

prev