Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1588 m/e 03/1908
British Railways 31588 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/06/1962
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1908
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
73F   Ashford m/e 09/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 73F Ashford 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1588
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31588    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
23/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31588    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev