Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 47 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 17816 Month
» 170769 Year
» 1836145 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
South Eastern and Chatham Railway 129 m/e 10/1913
Southern Railway (1924) 595 m/e 1924
Southern Railway (1925) A595 m/e 1925
Southern Railway (1931) 1595 m/e 1931
British Railways 31595 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class J
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1913
Withdrawal During 05/1951
Service Life 37 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1913
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 21/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
03/12/1948 Ashford Works Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. SLS/194901
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1913 To Service To service as South Eastern and Chatham Railway Number 129
Built at Ashford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 595    
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to A595    
1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 1595    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31595    
05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31595    
07/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev