Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern and Chatham Railway |
207 |
m/e |
10/1913 |
Southern Railway (1924) |
596 |
m/e |
1924 |
Southern Railway (1925) |
A596 |
m/e |
1925 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1596 |
m/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31596 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
J |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1913 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1951 |
Service Life |
38 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1913 |
AFD |
|
Ashford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/09/1951 |
Ashford Works |
Diesel-electric 10202 away to Nine Elms for working to West of England; Diesel 15230 being painted, 15231 almost ready. 31176 cut up 18th September, (3)1175 to be done later in the same week. 31596 (the only surviving class J 0-6-4T) cleaned and touched up for official photograph. |
SLS/195110 |
31/10/1951 |
Last Wainwright \"J\" |
The last 'J' Wainwright 0-6-4T, No. 31596, has been withdrawn for scrapping. Built for heavy outer suburban services in 1913, with superheater and piston valves, all five of the class have for a number of years been stationed at Ashford. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1913 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern and Chatham Railway Number 207 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 596 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A596 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1596 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31596 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31596 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|