Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 333 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18136 Week
» 71152 Month
» 190679 Year
» 3217532 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1613 |
m/e |
06/1928 |
British Railways |
31613 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1613 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31613 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31613 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|