Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 35 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2833 Week
» 14515 Month
» 167468 Year
» 1832844 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1620 m/e 11/1928
British Railways 31620 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/04/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1928
RDG   Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C   Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953
70C   Guildford 4w/e 30/12/1953
71A   Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73C Hither Green m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 6w/e 30/12/1953
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1620
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31620    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31620    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev