Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 583 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4265 Week
» 10973 Month
» 163926 Year
» 1829302 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1621 m/e 12/1928
British Railways 31621 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 5w/e 31/10/1950
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B   Bournemouth 4w/e 06/10/1951
71B   Bournemouth 5w/e 08/10/1951
70A   Nine Elms w/e 06/12/1951
73C   Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 21/06/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73C Hither Green m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms w/e 21/06/1955
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1621
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31621    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31621    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev