Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1622 m/e 01/1929
British Railways 31622 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 35 yrs , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1929
BM   Bournemouth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71C   Dorchester 4w/e 01/10/1953
72C   Yeovil Town 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C   Guildford 4w/e 06/11/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BM Bournemouth m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 71C Dorchester 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford 9w/e 31/10/1954
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1929 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1622
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31622    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31622    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev