Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 42 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 17811 Month
» 170764 Year
» 1836140 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1624 m/e 02/1929
British Railways 31624 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1929
BM   Bournemouth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
DOR   Dorchester 5w/e 15/10/1949
70C   Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1950
71A   Eastleigh 5w/e 24/08/1953
70C   Guildford 4w/e 01/10/1953
70A   Nine Elms 7w/e 27/08/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BM Bournemouth m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC DOR Dorchester 5w/e 15/10/1949
TOSTORE 71C Dorchester m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 24/08/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms q/e 27/08/1956
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1929 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1624
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31624    
15/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (DOR)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
27/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31624    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev