Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 46 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 864 Week
» 17815 Month
» 170768 Year
» 1836144 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1627 m/e 04/1929
British Railways 31627 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1929
BAS   Basingstoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAS   Basingstoke 3w/e 28/05/1949
70C   Guildford 7w/e 22/04/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAS Basingstoke 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 70C Guildford 7w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1929 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1627
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31627    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS)    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31627    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev